Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Licensing Exemption - Physicians With Traveling Athletic and Sports Teams
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Hammen, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified physicians, under specified circumstances, to practice medicine in the State without a license issued by the State Board of Physicians and without submitting to a criminal history records check while providing medical care to an athletic team's or a sports team's members, band members, cheerleading squad, mascot, coaches, and other staff; requiring that specified physicians can only provide medical care in the State for a maximum of 45 days in a calendar year; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {606382/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 3:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {606382/1 Report Adopted 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 28
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 54
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM