Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Attar, Bridges, and Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War; authorizing the Commission to raise funds for its operation; requiring the Commission, in consultation with certain persons, to conduct research to advance the documentation of African American patriots in the American Revolutionary War; requiring the Commission to develop a plan to commemorate Maryland African America patriots at certain sites by the placement of statues, landmarks plaques, or historical markers; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1294 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 4:01 PM