Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District Court
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Maryland Judiciary)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the number of resident judges of the circuit court in Anne Arundel, Baltimore, Charles, Montgomery, and Prince George's counties and Baltimore City; and increasing the number of resident judges of the District Court in District 5 (Prince George's County) and District 6 (Montgomery County).
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0167
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/09/2014 1/10/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 45
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation 44
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM