Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Office of the Inspector General for General Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron and Krimm
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Office of the Inspector General for General Services as an independent unit of the State; establishing the Inspector General in the Office; providing for the eligibility, professional qualifications, appointment, term, and removal of the Inspector General; providing for the Inspector General's duties and powers when investigating the management and affairs of the Department of General Services; prohibiting the Inspector General from taking certain actions under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0380
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
5/27/2020
Legislative Date
5/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Office of the Inspector General for General Services
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 5/27/2020 5/27/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Office of the Inspector General for General Services
(   4-101,   4-2A-01 through 4-2A-06 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2021 4:12 PM
Click to return on the top page