Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Credits for Property in Neighborhood Conservation Area
Sponsored by
Delegate Lafferty
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a property tax credit against the State property tax imposed on specified real property located in a neighborhood conservation area under specified circumstances; establishing the amount of the property tax credit, subject to a specified limitation; and requiring that specified properties be purchased from July 1, 2012, through June 30, 2021, to qualify for a specified county or municipal corporation property tax credit for specified owner-occupied, residential real property in designated areas; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0335 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-110, 9-255 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM