Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegate Angel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the defined term "emergency vehicle" to include a blood, organ, or tissue delivery vehicle; defining the term "blood, organ, or tissue delivery vehicle"; authorizing the driver of an emergency vehicle to exercise certain privileges while transporting, under certain circumstances, human blood, organs, or tissue or medical personnel; authorizing blood, organ, or tissue delivery vehicles to be equipped with certain light or signal devices; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0662 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery Vehicles
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-104.1, 11-118, 16-104.1, 21-106, 22-218 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM