Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Disclosure of Financial Interests
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Lafferty
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a member of the General Assembly who is required under the Maryland Public Ethics Law to publicly disclose specified information to disclose the same information to a governmental entity in the State if the legislator engages in specified business-related communication with an official or employee of the governmental entity; specifying the manner of disclosure to the governmental entity; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0222 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/10/2014 1/13/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-513, 15-607 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM