Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Large Employers - Disclosure of Aggregate Incurred Claims
Sponsored by
Delegates Hammen and Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a health insurance carrier to disclose the aggregate incurred claims of the group to a large employer if the carrier is experience rating the large employer's health benefit plan; requiring the disclosure of the aggregate incurred claims to be made within 30 days after receipt of a request from the large employer and in a specified format; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0212
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {576588/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {576588/1 Report Adopted 36
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 38
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 First Reading Finance 38
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1411 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM