Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Occupational Safety and Health Standards to Protect Employees - Aerosol Transmissible Diseases and COVID-19
Sponsored by
Delegate Valderrama
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to adopt regulations, by October 1, 2021, establishing an occupational safety and health standard protecting employees from exposure to aerosol transmissible diseases; requiring the Secretary of Labor, the Commissioner, and the Maryland Department of Health to develop an Emergency Temporary Occupational Safety and Health Standard to Protect Employees From COVID-19 by March 1, 2021, and to make the information available on the Department of Labor's website; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/14/2020
Legislative Date
10/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 10/14/2020 10/14/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Occupational Safety and Health Standards to Protect Employees - Aerosol Transmissible Diseases and COVID-19
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 2:54 PM
Click to return on the top page