Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Misuse of Laser Pointer
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Clark, Jackson, and Morgan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly and willfully shining, pointing, or focusing the beam of a laser pointer on an individual operating a motor vehicle or vessel; and applying a penalty of imprisonment not exceeding 3 years or a fine not exceeding $2,500 or both for a violation of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Misuse of Laser Pointer
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {302616/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Misuse of Laser Pointer
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Misuse of Laser Pointer
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {302616/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Misuse of Laser Pointer
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
(   3-807 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page