Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Home Games
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Buckel, Ebersole, Frush, Glass, Glenn, Grammer, Holmes, Hornberger, C. Howard, Kipke, Lam, Luedtke, Pendergrass, Valderrama, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing an individual who is at least 21 years old to conduct a home game involving wagering if the home game is conducted in a specified manner; and limiting to $1000 the total amount of money, tokens representing money, or any other thing or consideration of value that may be wagered by all players during any 24-hour period.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0311
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0059 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {805662/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {789935/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Delegates Ebersole, Fennell, and Hornberger
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Senators King, Eckardt, and Currie
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {805662/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 32
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {789935/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 53
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Delegates Ebersole, Fennell, and Hornberger 62
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senators King, Eckardt, and Currie 61
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 65
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM