Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - Exception
Sponsored by
Delegate Frank
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified members of the Judges' Retirement System may receive additional service credit for military service if the member has a specified amount of service credit earned through employment by a specified date, is unable to accumulate 10 years of service credit due to mandatory retirement at age 70, becomes a retiree due to mandatory retirement, and has a specified amount of service credit at the time of retirement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0188
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/10/2014 1/13/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM