Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Disabilities Plan and Interagency Disabilities Board - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Disabilities)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the date, from October 1 to December 1 of each year, by which the Secretary of Disabilities must submit an annual analysis of the State's progress in implementing the State Disabilities Plan and related performance objectives to the Governor and the General Assembly; altering the membership of the Interagency Disabilities Board; and altering the required elements of the State Disabilities Plan.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Disabilities Plan and Interagency Disabilities Board - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Disabilities Plan and Interagency Disabilities Board - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Disabilities Plan and Interagency Disabilities Board - Revisions
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 26
Text - Third - State Disabilities Plan and Interagency Disabilities Board - Revisions
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 28
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Referred Finance 27
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Text - Chapter - State Disabilities Plan and Interagency Disabilities Board - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-113, 7-128, 7-132 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM