Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Busch and Cain
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 4
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a certain annual appropriation in the State Budget for the Mayor and Aldermen of the City of Annapolis to pay for services provided to the State by the City of Annapolis be at least $750,000; and requiring that each fiscal year starting in fiscal year 2022, the annual appropriation be increased by the increase in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers for the Baltimore Metropolitan Statistical Area.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-11)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-5)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 4
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
House 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (128-11) 27
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 27
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable Adopted 36
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Second Reading Passed 36
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-5) 38
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Returned Passed 40
Post Passage 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 4
Text - Chapter - Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM