Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Task Force to Study Methods to Reduce the Rate of Uninsured Drivers
Sponsored by
Delegate Rudolph
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Methods to Reduce the Rate of Uninsured Drivers; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations, including those regarding the rate of uninsured drivers in the State and in other states and the ways in which the rate is calculated in Maryland, and methods to lower the cost of insurance as a way to reduce the rate of uninsured drivers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0153
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/14/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433495/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-3)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/10/2014 1/13/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/14/2014 1/14/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments {433495/1 Report Adopted 21
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-3) 23
Senate 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 First Reading Finance 22
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM