Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, B. Barnes, Brooks, Frick, Hettleman, Jalisi, Lafferty, Morhaim, Proctor, B. Robinson, Stein, Sydnor, and P. Young
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reestablishing the African American Heritage Preservation Program in the Maryland Historical Trust to identify and preserve buildings, communities, and sites of historical and cultural importance to the African American experience in the State; requiring the Trust to develop and administer the Program in partnership with the Commission on African American History and Culture; requiring the Governor, for each fiscal year, to include $1,000,000 for the Program in the annual operating or capital budget; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0601
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/4 (Delegate Rey) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/10 (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Special Order until 3/4 (Delegate Rey) Adopted 35
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Second Reading Passed 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Special Order until 3/10 (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted 38
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 40
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 40
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM