Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Lobbying - Legislative Unit Meals and Receptions - Publication of Report (General Assembly Online Social Calendar)
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Hill, Lam, and Moon
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services to post on the Web site of the General Assembly a legislative unit registration report that includes information on specified meals and receptions.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1272 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM