Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey and Stein
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a State or local law enforcement agency and State or local volunteer fire company, rescue squad, fire department, and ambulance service to place a move over safety monitoring system on, or integrate a move over safety monitoring system into, an emergency vehicle for the purpose of recording a motor vehicle committing a violation relating to the operation of a motor vehicle on approach of an emergency vehicle; providing a certain recorded image is admissible in a proceeding concerning a certain civil citation; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0319
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1368 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-311, 4-401, 7-302 )
(   21-405, 21-405.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:36 PM
Click to return on the top page