Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - City of Takoma Park - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B On- and Off-Sale License MC 18-14
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing an off-sale privilege to the Class B beer and light wine license issued for hotels and restaurants in the City of Takoma Park.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0302
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/10/2014 1/13/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2014 3/07/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 43A
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Second Reading Passed 43A
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 44
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM