Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Nondisparagement Clauses in Consumer Contracts - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, Moon, Kramer, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a contract or a proposed contract for the sale or lease of consumer goods or services from including a provision waiving the consumer's right to make a specified statement; prohibiting a person from threatening or seeking enforcement of a specified contract provision; prohibiting a person from penalizing a consumer for making a specified statement; providing that the Act does not limit a person from including in a specified contract a provision prohibiting a consumer from making specified disclosures; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {403093/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {153193/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-7)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Floor Committee Amendment {403093/1 Adopted 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {153193/1 Report Adopted 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-7) 28
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Finance 28
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1325 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM