Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - College Savings Plan Accounts - Contributions (College Savings Tax Enhancement Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $2,500 to $5,000, the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for contributions made by certain individuals whose federal adjusted gross income does not exceed $225,000 or, in the case of a married individual filing a separate return, $150,000 to certain college savings plan accounts; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0650
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - College Savings Plan Accounts - Contributions (College Savings Tax Enhancement Act)
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM