Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Reckless Endangerment - Repeal of Specific Charging Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Vallario, Carter, Conaway, Glass, Jalisi, Moon, Morales, Rosenberg, Smith, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that a defendant must be charged specifically with reckless endangerment to be found guilty of reckless endangerment.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0306
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0787 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM