Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Pollinator Habitat Plans
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, Healey, Lierman, S. Robinson, Carr, and Bromwell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources, the Maryland Environmental Service, and the State Highway Administration, in consultation with the Department of Agriculture, to each establish a specified pollinator habitat plan by July 1, 2017, and to make each plan available to the public on each State agency's web site by September 1, 2017; requiring specified State agencies to report to specified committees of the General Assembly by January 1, 2018, on the implementation of each pollinator habitat plan; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {390111/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {390111/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM