Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Driver's Licenses - Victims of Robbery or Burglary
Sponsored by
Delegates Fennell, Barron, C. Howard, Jackson, Knotts, J. Lewis, Proctor, Tarlau, and A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration, when processing an application for a duplicate license of a victim of a robbery or burglary whose license is taken during the robbery or burglary, to issue the duplicate license free of charge if the victim of the robbery or burglary whose license is taken presents a police report of the incident when applying for a duplicate license.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0580
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2018
Legislative Date
1/16/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {450116/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Driver's Licenses - Victims of Robbery or Burglary
House 1/16/2018 1/16/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Hearing canceled
House 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable with Amendments {450116/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Driver's Licenses - Victims of Robbery or Burglary
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM