Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Stadium Authority)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to provide for the renovation of the Ocean City Convention facility; increasing, from $17,340,000 to $21,700,000, the amount the Board of Public Works may approve for the issuance of certain bonds related to the Ocean City Convention facility without receiving authorization by the General Assembly; altering certain contribution amounts, allocations of savings, and leasehold ownership allocations that must be contained in a certain lease or other written agreement with Ocean City; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-3)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (130-3) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Referred Rules 64 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-628, 10-643 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page