Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Motor Vehicle Batteries - Recycling
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller and S. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring any person selling motor vehicle batteries for retail sale in the State to accept all used motor vehicle batteries offered by customers for recycling and to post a sign in accordance with specified requirements; requiring a person accepting used motor vehicle batteries to provide for the recycling of each battery within 90 days and in accordance with specified regulations; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt regulations; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-1101, 9-1701, 9-1712 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM