Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Proceeds - Education Trust Fund - Security and Mental Health Services at Public Schools
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke (By Request - Anne Arundel County Administration) and Delegates Dwyer, Hough, and McDonough
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the use of video lottery proceeds credited to the Education Trust Fund to provide funds for security personnel and equipment at public elementary and secondary schools and for mental health services to students at public elementary and secondary schools.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM