Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Education Article of the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Buckel, Dumais, Ebersole, Gutierrez, Kaiser, Kramer, McMillan, Moon, Platt, S. Robinson, Sophocleus, and Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Education Article of the Annotated Code of Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding where library services should be located within the Education Article of the Annotated Code of Maryland; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0338
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM