Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Electronic Transactions - Sale of Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a consumer shall be deemed not to have agreed to enter into a contract for the sale of a vehicle with a dealer by electronic means unless the dealer provides the consumer with a clear and readable copy of the complete contract in a certain format and with a reasonable opportunity for the consumer to review the copy of the contract before providing an electronic signature; defining "consumer", "dealer", and "vehicle"; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0134
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Electronic Transactions - Sale of Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Electronic Transactions - Sale of Vehicles
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 7:41 PM