Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ethics Law - Soliciting the Employment of Lobbyist
Sponsored by
Delegate O'Donnell
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a State official or public official from directly or indirectly initiating a solicitation for a person to retain the services of a particular regulated lobbyist or lobbying firm.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0471 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-102, 15-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM