Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms
Sponsored by
Delegate Knotts
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, that a diaper-changing facility be installed in certain restrooms in certain public buildings; requiring the Board of Public Works, through the Department of General Services, to adopt certain standards; requiring a certain standard to be filed with the Secretary of State; providing that the Department of General Services is responsible for the enforcement of the Act under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0782
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-801 through 2-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM