Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Residential Service Agencies – Training Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each residential service agency, beginning July 1, 2022, to ensure that certain individuals receive certain training relating to dementia; providing that certain training may be provided by a certain supervisory staff member; prohibiting a residential service agency from requiring certain individuals to complete certain training; requiring an individual who provides certain training to issue a certification of completion to each individual who completes the training; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0275
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/31/2020
Legislative Date
8/31/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/31/2020 8/31/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health – Residential Service Agencies – Training Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 1:43 PM