Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental)
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the time period during which the Commissioner of Financial Regulation must examine the business of specified mortgage lender licensees from at least once during any 36-month period to at least once during any 60-month period; and altering the minimum time period for which licensed mortgage lenders must retain specified records from 25 to 61 months.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0033
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-513, 11-515 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM