Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application (I'm Alive Today App)
Sponsored by
Delegate McKay
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a local department of social services, if appropriate, to monitor an opioid-exposed newborn through a certain mobile application under certain circumstances; requiring a local department to assess the risk of harm to and safety of an opioid-exposed newborn; requiring the Social Services Administration to develop a mobile application to be used by parents who have a certain opioid addiction to check in periodically and to alert the local department if a parent fails to do so; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1271 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Family Law - Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application (I'm Alive Today App)
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   5-704.2, 5-704.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page