Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Officials
Sponsored by
Delegate O'Donnell
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting former State officials or public officials of the Executive Branch who had duties related to State legislative matters and the General Assembly or to procurement, as specified, for 1 year after leaving State employment, from assisting or representing another party for compensation in a matter that is the subject of legislative action or that is related to that procurement; providing exceptions to allow the former officials to represent a municipal corporation, county, or State governmental entity; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0374 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM