Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Libraries - Regional, State, and County - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Barve, Carr, Chang, Dumais, Ebersole, Gutierrez, Jalisi, Kaiser, Knotts, Kramer, Lam, Moon, Patterson, Platt, S. Robinson, Sophocleus, and Turner
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of specified funding for each participating regional resource center, the State Library Resource Center, and each county public library system for specified fiscal years.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0337
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-205, 23-503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM