Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Uninsured or Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage - Property Damage
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that certain motor vehicle liability insurance policies must contain coverage for damages, subject to the policy limits, that the insured is entitled to recover from the owner or operator of certain motor vehicles because of property damage, including the loss of the insured vehicle; and altering the amounts to which certain motorist coverage in certain policies must be equal.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
22
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Insurance - Uninsured or Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage - Property Damage
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 20
Text - Third - Insurance - Uninsured or Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage - Property Damage
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 21
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Referred Finance 22
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 12:10 PM