Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Quota for Class B Licenses
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
In the House - Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing in Frederick County a license quota for Class B (on-sale) beer licenses and Class B (on-sale) beer and wine licenses.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0215
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Quota for Class B Licenses
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 10:36 AM