Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public Charter Schools - Capital Improvement Requests
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke (By Request - Anne Arundel County Administration) and Delegates Dwyer, Hough, McDonough, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making public charter schools eligible to receive State funds for school construction subject to specified requirements; requiring the public charter school to submit a specified request for a capital improvement project to the county board of education; requiring the county board to establish a deadline for request submission; requiring the county board to make a specified evaluation of the request; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0174
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM