Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - High School Teachers Teaching Dual Enrollment Courses - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Kerr and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain county boards of education to allow a high school teacher to teach a dual enrollment course offered by an institution of higher education if the teacher has earned a master's degree or higher degree in the field of instruction or has earned a certain degree, has taught a college-level course, has received certain professional development, and has been observed and approved for instruction by a particular faculty member.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - High School Teachers Teaching Dual Enrollment Courses - Qualifications
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-124 )
Last Updated: 1/30/2020 2:49 PM