Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsored by
Delegate Otto
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the salary of the Sheriff of Somerset County from not less than $60,000 to not less than $75,000; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0134
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed 47
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 49
Senate 3/31/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM