Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Safe Schools Maryland Act of 2019
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Arikan, Bartlett, Beitzel, Buckel, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Clark, Corderman, M. Fisher, Grammer, Hartman, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, Malone, Mangione, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Pippy, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Safe Schools Maryland Program in the Maryland Center for School Safety; requiring the School Safety Subcabinet to develop program guidance on or before September 1, 2019; requiring a local school system that elects to participate in the program to follow the program guidance; requiring the Center to perform certain tasks related to the program; providing that certain documents and information submitted to the Center are not subject to the Maryland Public Information Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0165
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Safe Schools Maryland Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Safe Schools Maryland Act of 2019
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-1513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM