Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Delegates Branch, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Glenn, Hammen, Haynes, McHale, McIntosh, Mitchell, Oaks, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program in Baltimore City provide for the exchange of used hypodermic needles and syringes for sterile hypodermic needles and syringes on a one-for-one basis; and altering the name of the Program.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2013 3/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM