Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education Compensation Commission MC 1-18
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Montgomery County Board of Education Compensation Commission to study the salaries of the members of the Montgomery County Board of Education; providing for the membership, appointment, removal, terms, chair, meeting requirements, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to issue a report and make recommendations to the members of the Montgomery County delegation to the General Assembly regarding the compensation of the members of the Board by September 1, 2019, and every 4 years thereafter; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Montgomery County Board of Education Compensation Commission MC 1-18
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Montgomery County Board of Education Compensation Commission MC 1-18
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County Board of Education Compensation Commission MC 1-18
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Montgomery County Board of Education Compensation Commission MC 1-18
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Montgomery County Board of Education Compensation Commission MC 1-18
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County Board of Education Compensation Commission MC 1-18
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-901, 3-902 )
(   28-1A-01 through 28-1A-07 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM