Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside and Unattended in Extreme Weather
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Frush, Gaines, Healey, Hettleman, Lam, McMillan, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, S. Robinson, Smith, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from leaving a dog outside and unattended by use of a specified restraint for a period longer than 15 minutes when a hazardous weather warning issued by the National Weather Service is in effect for the local area; prohibiting a person from leaving a dog outside and unattended by use of a specified restraint for a period longer than 1 hour when the local temperature is above or below a specified temperature; and establishing penalties, not to exceed $1,000 per conviction, for violation of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Reassigned to Judiciary 16
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-623 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM