Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Time Period for Filing Administrative Charges - Reduction
Sponsored by
Delegate Cluster
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing from 1 year to 90 days the period of time under the Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights during which a law enforcement agency may file administrative charges against a law enforcement officer after becoming aware of an act giving rise to a charge for those acts not involving criminal activity or excessive force.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page