Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Home Builder Registration Act - Guaranty Fund - Claims
Sponsored by
Delegates Davis and Holmes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing to $7,500 the maximum amount of a claim against the Maryland Home Builder Guaranty Fund for which the Consumer Protection Division may issue a specified proposed order; and increasing to 60 the number of days, following specified notice by the Division, after which the Division may bring a specified action in court against a registered home builder who fails to reimburse the Fund in full for payment of a specified claim.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {313195/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable with Amendments {313195/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 32
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Finance 32
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4.5-707, 4.5-711 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM