Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Charter School Facility Fund
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Public Charter School Facility Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying that the Fund shall be used to provide funding to public charter schools in the State to acquire, plan, develop, finance, construct, improve, repair, and maintain public charter school facilities; requiring the State Department of Education to administer the Fund; requiring the Governor to appropriate a certain amount to the Fund each year; requiring the Department to establish certain procedures for schools to request funds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0172
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Charter School Facility Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public Charter School Facility Fund
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 5-324 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM