Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke and Griffith
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a local board of elections to contact and obtain input from large residential institutional communities including institutions of higher education, continuing care retirement communities, senior communities, and military installations when establishing precinct boundaries and designating the location of polling places; requiring the State Board of Elections to maintain a page on its website that includes certain information about and links regarding voter registration and voting by certain students; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0283
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/21/2020
Legislative Date
9/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/21/2020 9/21/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:50 PM