Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Joint Committee on Transparency and Open Government - Study on Requiring Public Bodies to Provide Agendas Under the Open Meetings Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Bates, Elliott, W. Miller, Ready, and Stocksdale
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Joint Committee on Transparency and Open Government to conduct a study on requiring public bodies to provide agendas under the Open Meetings Act; requiring that the study take into consideration specified factors; requiring the Joint Committee to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2015; and providing for the termination of the Act as of the end of June 30, 2015.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0847
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {426781/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Dyson) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Getty) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {426781/1 Report Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 58
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Dyson) Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Getty) Adopted 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM